PARDEA v. U S ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Petitioner: MARK PARDEA
Respondent: JOHN KELLY and U S ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 4:2020cv00439
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (cle)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The magistrate judge's #3 report and recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The clerk shall enter judgment stating: "All claims against William Barr and John Kelly are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction." Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 10/15/2020. (cle)
October 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re: #3 Report and Recommendation. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle)
October 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #4 Mail Returned and #5 Mail Returned. (cle)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark Pardea and returned: 2 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark Pardea and returned: #3 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (cle)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ORDER: Petitioner's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #1 at 7, is GRANTED. Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. RECOMMENDATION: It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 , be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/14/2020. (cle) (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/13/2020.)
September 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cle)
September 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARK PARDEA. (cle) *** No Service Copies provided. No Filing Fee paid or IFP filed. ***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARDEA v. U S ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK PARDEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?