RUSS v. WASTE PRO USA INC et al
Plaintiff: MARSHAUN RUSS
Defendant: SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC and WASTE PRO USA INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00442
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 WASTE PRO USA, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (BELBECK, JENNIFER) Modified to edit title on 10/28/2020 (rcb).
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 DEFENDANT SOUTHEAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/10/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (MARSH, KRISTINA) Modified to edit title on 10/28/2020 (rcb).
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadline - CRD to review case and prepare PTO by 3/9/2021. (tss)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/23/20. Discovery due by 4/9/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/30/2021. Mediation Report due by 5/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2020 - 1:02 to 1:11 p.m. - Marie Mattox present for the plaintiff, Jennifer Belbeck and Christina Flores present for the defendants - written order to follow(Court Reporter Megan Hague (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND DENYING #5 & #7 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion for an extension (ECF No. #12 ), which is unopposed (ECF No. #18 ), is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No. #15 ) is accepted as timely filed. Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #5 , #7 ) are DENIED as moot. Defendants' must respond to the First Amended Complaint by 10/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/19/2020. (rcb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conferral Under N.D. Local Rule 7.1 by MARSHAUN RUSS (MATTOX, MARIE)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 01:00 PM before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. However, the Court also understands that under the current circumstances, a cell phone may be all that is available. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE UPDATED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. No later than 10/16/2020, Plaintiff must confer with counsel for Defendants and file a supplemental certificate of conference. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/14/2020. (rcb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MARSHAUN RUSS. (MATTOX, MARIE)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE/APPROVAL OF THE REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING FILED BY DEFENDANT ON OCTOBER 12, 2020 (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified to edit title on 10/13/2020 (rcb).
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT OF THE PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING (MARSH, KRISTINA) Modified to edit title on 10/13/2020 (rcb).
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified to edit title on 10/22/2020 (rcb).
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/4/20. Plaintiffs deadline to respond to both motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #5 & #7 ) is October 9, 2020. ( #10 Order is amended to correct erroneous title) (tss)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOTPlaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension (ECF No. #9 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to both motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 5 & 7) is 10/9/2020. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/02/2020. (rcb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT WASTE PRO'S MOTION TO DISMISS (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified to edit title on 10/2/2020 (rcb).
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 DEFENDANT SOUTHEAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (MARSH, KRISTINA) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb).
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANT SOUTHEAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/9/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (MARSH, KRISTINA) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb).
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS (MARSH, KRISTINA) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 WASTE PRO USA, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (TINGLEY, AMY) Modified to edit title on 9/18/2020 (rcb).
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 WASTE PRO USA, INC'S RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (BELBECK, JENNIFER) Modified to edit title on 9/18/2020 (rcb).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/12/2020. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BELBECK, JENNIFER)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WASTE PRO USA INC from Second Judicial Circuit In and For Gadsden County Florida, case number 20000400CAA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5643138.), filed by WASTE PRO USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court Documents) (BELBECK, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSS v. WASTE PRO USA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC
Represented By: KRISTINA LYNN MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO USA INC
Represented By: JENNIFER ELOUISE BELBECK
Represented By: AMY S TINGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHAUN RUSS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?