YOUELLS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CATHERINE YOUELLS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 4:2020cv00492
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, per #4 ORDER. (All 3 summons, along with three certified copies of this order, the service copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms, sent to USMS. (mb)
November 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 NOTICE Regarding Service of Process, per #4 ORDER. (mb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Service of Process by CATHERINE YOUELLS (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
November 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 ORDER. (Summons, USM 285 forms and 3 Service Copies due by 11/5/2020). (No service copies or paperwork received back from plaintiff). (mb)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to forward to Plaintiff three summonses and blank USM 285 forms. Plaintiff must submit the summonses and completed USM 285 forms within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, along with three service copies of the complaint. Upon receipt of the summonses, completed USM 285 forms, and copies of the complaint, the clerk of court must issue the summonses and return them, along with three certified copies of this order, the service copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms, to the United States Marshals Service (USMS). (Forms emailed to plaintiff's attorney). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/15/2020. (mb)
October 15, 2020 Set Deadlines re #4 ORDER. (Summons, USM 285 forms and 3 Service Copies due by 11/5/2020). (mb)
October 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CATHERINE YOUELLS. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by CATHERINE YOUELLS. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUELLS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE YOUELLS
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LIEBENHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?