SALTERS v. CAMPBELL et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRIC SALTERS
Defendant: rocky hanna, JACK CAMPBELL and LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00517
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 DEFENDANT ROCKY HANNA, SUPERINTENDENT LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (PLATT RADY, KAYLA) Modified to edit title on 12/22/2020 (rcb).
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED WRONGFUL ARREST AND MALICIOUS PROSECUTION COMPLAINT against JACK CAMPBELL, ROCKY HANNA, LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, filed by DIMITRIC SALTERS. (COLLINS, RICHARD) Modified Title on 12/10/2020 (blb).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT. The complaint is dismissed. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 12/14/2020. The defendant Rocky Hanna's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #7 , is denied as moot. The motion to stay, ECF No. #8 , is denied without prejudice to renewal if an amended complaint is filed and any motion to dismiss it is denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/25/20. (blb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS REFERENCED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT [DE 1] BUT OMITTED FROM FILING by ROCKY HANNA, LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint DE 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint DE 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint DE 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint DE 1) (MARSEY, JOHN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order by ROCKY HANNA. (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ROCKY HANNA. (Attachments: #1 Docket) (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD Re: 3 NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing and Attorney Admissions Requirements mailed to RICHARD COLLINS. (blb) (blb)
November 11, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings per INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER #6 : Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. (blb)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2020. Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/11/20. (blb)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY on behalf of ROCKY HANNA, LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
November 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. An ISO is needed. (blb)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN DAVID MARSEY on behalf of ROCKY HANNA, LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS (MARSEY, JOHN)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing and Attorney Admissions Requirements mailed toRICHARD COLLINS. (blb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD Re #1 COMPLAINT- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedures in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing' and/or Chapter 10 of the 'CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website) specifically in regards to the use of UPPERCASE in the parties names and style of the case AND SUBMISSION OF A SIGNED PLEADING. (blb)
November 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Admissions due by 11/16/2020. (blb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACK CAMPBELL, rocky hanna ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5742096.), filed by DIMITRIC SALTERS. (HOWARD, PHILLIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALTERS v. CAMPBELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRIC SALTERS
Represented By: PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD
Represented By: RICHARD B COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rocky hanna
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: JOHN DAVID MARSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: JOHN DAVID MARSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?