DELAFLOR MORALES v. BARR et al
Petitioner: FRANCISCO DELAFLOR MORALES
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR and JOHN KELLY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00533
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (cle)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The #6 Report and Recommendation is adopted, and it is incorporated into this order. The clerk will enter a judgment that says "The habeas petition is dismissed as moot." The clerk will then close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 1/6/2021. (cle)
January 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections to R&R Deadline expired, none filed. (blb)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Francisco Delaflor Morales and returned: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (cle)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED as moot because it appears that Petitioner is no longer in detention. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 12/7/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/4/2021. (cle)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 12/7/2020. (cle)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Francisco Delaflor Morales and returned: 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
November 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by FRANCISCO DELAFLOR MORALES. (cle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by FRANCISCO DELAFLOR MORALES. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELAFLOR MORALES v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCISCO DELAFLOR MORALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?