KRAMER v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: PHILLIP KRAMER
Defendant: WELLPATH LLC, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, THE GEO GROUP, INC. and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES
Case Number: 4:2021cv00065
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STAYING CASE - Defendant Florida Department of Corrections's consent motion to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. #17 , is GRANTED in part. This Court will STAY this case until 5/17/2021. The parties shall file a status report on or before 5/17/2021, indicating the status of this case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/16/2021. (cle)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Extend Time by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (JOHNSON, ANTHONY)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILLIP KRAMER. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021; FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (ANDREWS, RYAN)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PHILLIP KRAMER. Amendment to #2 Civil Cover Sheet . (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to WELLPATH LLC. (cle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to THE GEO GROUP, INC. (cle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES. (cle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES. (cle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID AARON WEISZ on behalf of PHILLIP KRAMER (WEISZ, DAVID)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (cle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by PHILLIP KRAMER (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES, THE GEO GROUP, INC., WELLPATH LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5918712.), filed by PHILLIP KRAMER. (VERNAGLIA, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRAMER v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: ANTHONY DEAN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP KRAMER
Represented By: RYAN JOSHUA ANDREWS
Represented By: JOHN M VERNAGLIA
Represented By: DAVID AARON WEISZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?