ABDUL v. INCH et al
Plaintiff: MUJAAHID ABDUL JABBAAR and JABBAAR M ABDUL
Defendant: HUNTER and MARK INCH
Case Number: 4:2021cv00153
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to HUNTER, MARK INCH. (jcw)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of court shall issue summons for Secretary Mark Inch and Captain Hunter, indicating that the Defendants have SIXTY (60) DAYS in which to file a response Plaintiff's complaint. The clerk shall refer the summonses to the United States Marshals Service, along with a copy of this order, the service copies of Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. #1 ), and the service copies of Plaintiffs motion for TRO (Doc. #3 ). Any party who desires to consent to trial of this case by a Magistrate Judge should execute the attached consent form and return it to the clerk of the court. The clerk will retain any such form and will refer the consent form to the district judge only if all parties consent. ( Notify Chambers on 7/12/2021.)(Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/27/2021. (jcw)(Documents provided to USMS as ordered.)
May 25, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 8 Service copies received. (jcw)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: 2 service copies of #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION received. (jcw)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING, #1 Complaint. On or before 6/11/2021, Plaintiff shall provide the court with two service copies of his complaint and motion for TRO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/12/2021. (jcw)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 16.00, receipt number FLN300014560. (alb)
May 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 6 Initial Partial Filing Fee Received. (alb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court shall assess Plaintiff $16.00 as an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Plaintiff shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS (5/10/2021) from the date this order is docketed in which to submit the initial partial filing fee as assessed by the clerk of court. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Any party who desires to consent to trial of this case by a Magistrate Judge should execute the attached consent form and return it to the clerk of the court. The clerk will retain any such form and will refer the consent form to the district judge only if all parties consent. The clerk of court shall change the docket to reflect Plaintiffs name as "Jabbaar M. Abdul, a/k/a Mujaahid Abdul Jabbaar." (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 4/8/2021. (jcw)(Plaintiff's name changed as ordered. cc: DOC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
April 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by MUJAAHID ABDUL JABBAAR. (jcw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MUJAAHID ABDUL JABBAAR. (jcw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MUJAAHID ABDUL JABBAAR. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABDUL v. INCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUJAAHID ABDUL JABBAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JABBAAR M ABDUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?