C&B FARMS INC v. SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP et al
Plaintiff: C&B FARMS, INC and C&B FARMS INC
Defendant: SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP., JORGE SANTOS and SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP
Case Number: 4:2021cv00214
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 **PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY**Set Deadlines- Notify Chambers & Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2021. (rcb) Modified to terminate 8/16/2021 deadline set in error on 7/27/2021 (rcb).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY. The plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct discovery prior to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference, ECF No. #6 , is granted. The plaintiff may conduct discovery related to locating and serving process on the defendants. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/23/2021. (rcb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by C&B FARMS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum on Barrett Logistics, Inc.) (BARMAT, MARC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by C&B FARMS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum on Barrett Logistics, Inc., #2 Text of Proposed Order) (BARMAT, MARC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by C&B FARMS INC as to All Defendants. (BARMAT, MARC)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP and (Attachments: #1JORGE SANTOS) (blb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel is advised by this entry for future case openings, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". (blb)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JORGE SANTOS, SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6107361.), filed by C&B FARMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Articles of Incorporation for Santos Fresh, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Account, #3 Exhibit 3 - Invoices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Santos Fresh Produce, #6 Summons Jorge Santos) (BARMAT, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C&B FARMS INC v. SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTOS FRESH PRODUCE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&B FARMS, INC
Represented By: MARC PHILIP BARMAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&B FARMS INC
Represented By: MARC PHILIP BARMAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?