DAVIS v. PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff: Dontrell Davis
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., Limited Partnership and PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 4:2021cv00255
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (cle)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: Jury Trial set for 6/20/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Discovery due by 1/27/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/17/2022. Mediation Report due by 3/10/2022. Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/10/2021. (vkm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE)
July 30, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2021. (kjw)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct docket text. (kjw)
July 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP identifying Other Affiliate PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, Other Affiliate PTL GP, LLC, Other Affiliate LJ VP Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate MBK USA Commercial Vehicles, Inc. for PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.. (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Penske Truck Leasing Co., Limited Partnership. (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/13/2021. Discovery Status Report due by 7/29/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2021. Discovery due by 10/27/2021. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/29/2021. (cle)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: TO ATTORNEY STEPHANIE GENEROTTI - re: #1 Notice of Removal. In this District, party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (cle)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Penske Truck Leasing Co., Limited Partnership from Second Judicial Circuit, Leon County, case number 2021-CA-000455. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6155140.), filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co., Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - NOF Notice of Removal) (GENEROTTI, STEPHANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., Limited Partnership
Represented By: STEPHANIE GENEROTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: SARAH JEAN KUEHNEL
Represented By: STEPHANIE GENEROTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontrell Davis
Represented By: ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?