MATHEWS v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: Raymond Mathews
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 4:2021cv00307
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed KILOLO KIJAKAZI served on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (alb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. The USMS must serve a copy of the complaint and summons upon Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security, and the Attorney General of the United States by certified mail and upon the office of the United States Attorney for this District by regular U.S. Mail or hand-delivery. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/27/2021. (alb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/27/2021) (alb). Modified on 7/27/2021 Documents placed in the USMS box for service (alb).
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint. 3 service copies received in Tallahassee Division and are being forwarded to Pensacola Division. (alb)
July 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Mathews. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) Modified on 7/29/2021 to remove attachment and attach to docket entry #1 Complaint (alb).
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond Mathews, filed by Raymond Mathews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2021: #2 Supplement Summons Atty Gen, #3 Supplement Summons SS Admin, #4 Supplement Summons USA, #5 Supplement Process Receipt and Return SSA, #6 Supplement Process Receipt and Return USA, #7 Supplement Process Receipt and Return Atty Gen) (alb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHEWS v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Mathews
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LIEBENHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?