BOOTH v. THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: PRESTON BOOTH
Defendant: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2021cv00460
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/28/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 5/16/2022. Status Report due by 2/14/2022. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/14/2022. (sjb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND DEFENSES by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING - This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No. #6 . The unopposed motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before 1/13/2022. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/22/2021. (sjb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TUCKER C MOTTA on behalf of THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (MOTTA, TUCKER)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION for THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (FURMAN, WENDY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED) by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRESTON BOOTH. THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY) (MACLAREN, ROBERT)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (vkm)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (vkm)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY ROBERT MACLAREN: Re #1 Complaint - Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". For future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website). (vkm)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6548345.), filed by PRESTON BOOTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS TO THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY) (MACLAREN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOOTH v. THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTON BOOTH
Represented By: ROBERT IAN MACLAREN, III
Represented By: DANIEL MARK SOLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TUCKER C MOTTA
Represented By: WENDY LYNN FURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?