WILLIAMS v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Petitioner: ISAAC WILLIAMS
Respondent: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION and STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2022cv00003
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Petitioner a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Petitioner must either pay the filing fee of $5.00, or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 02/23/2022. ( Fee or IFP due by 3/25/2022.) (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
February 22, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-02927. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this action to the Tallahassee Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/5/2022. (JT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Isaac Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ISAAC WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?