DAVIS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: SHEBA DAVIS
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 4:2022cv00006
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING CONSENTED MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. The Clerk shall take all necessary action to remand this case to the Circuit Court for the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, Florida. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant's pending motions to dismiss, ECF Nos. #7 and #10 . The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/23/2022. (rcb)**Copy of ECF #12 forwarded to Circuit Court for the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, Florida as directed**
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by SHEBA DAVIS. (MATTOX, MARIE)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/3/2022). (THOMPSON, THOMAS) Modified to edit title on 2/17/2022 (rcb).
February 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Initial Scheduling Order, (rcb)**Status Report not filed by 2/10/2022**
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by SHEBA DAVIS. (MATTOX, MARIE)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Inasmuch as Defendants have filed an amended motion to dismiss, ECF No. #7 , Defendant's first motion to dismiss, ECF No. #5 , is DENIED as moot Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 01/24/2022. (rcb)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/7/2022). (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/3/2022). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT) (THOMPSON, THOMAS) Modified to edit title on 1/21/2022 (rcb).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/24 /2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/23/2022. Discovery due by 5/10/2022. Status Report due by 2/10/2022. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 01/10/2022. (rcb)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MALLORY BENNETT BROWN on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (BROWN, MALLORY)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION FOR REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS from Circuit Court in and for Leon County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-001818. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6615454.), filed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) Modified to edit title on 1/10/2022 (rcb).
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE FILING by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT, #2 SUMMONS ISSUED & RETURN OF SERVICE) (THOMPSON, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEBA DAVIS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: THOMAS R THOMPSON
Represented By: MALLORY BENNETT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?