DAVIS v. FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: LLOYD ANTHONY DAVIS
Defendant: FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, REGION 1 PHARMACY and FNU PAWKK
Case Number: 4:2024cv00190
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The clerk of court shall forward to Plaintiff: a notice of voluntary dismissal form; and a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number should be written on the forms. On or before JUNE 5, 2024, Plaintiff shall: file a notice of voluntary dismissal; OR submit payment in the amount of $405.00; OR file a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the Northern District form that includes a motion with supporting affidavit, a prisoner consent form and a financial certificate with a printout of transactions in Plaintiff's inmate trust account for the period October 18, 2023 to the present. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order likely will result in this case being dismissed for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with an order of this court, and failure to pay the filing fee or properly seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 05/06/24. (Filing Fee, IFP motion, or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by 6/5/2024.) (Forms sent as directed.) (jfj)
May 1, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:24-cv-00210. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Florida. (LMF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/30/2024.]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Florida. The Clerk must forward the action to the district and close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/29/2024. (KLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/30/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/25/2024. (RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/30/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franklin Correctional Institution, FNU Pawkk, Region 1 Pharmacy filed by Lloyd Anthony Davis. (no fees paid, no service copies provided)(RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD ANTHONY DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGION 1 PHARMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU PAWKK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?