CULMER v. FLORIDA STATE HOSPITAL PSYCHOLOGY DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: ANTOINE ALPHEUS CULMER
Defendant: FLORIDA STATE HOSPITAL PSYCHOLOGY DEPARTMENT, HEATHER BURLAS and AMICARELLI
Case Number: 4:2024cv00247
Filed: June 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se (sjb)
June 17, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00586. Original file with documents received.
June 17, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order, #4 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency, #1 Complaint,. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (sjb)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/13/2024. (CAW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/17/2024.]
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Antoine Alpheus Culmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/17/2024.]
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heather Burlas, Mr. Amicarelli, The Florida State Hospital Psychology Department filed by Antoine Alpheus Culmer. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (One service copy received)(BGR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/17/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CULMER v. FLORIDA STATE HOSPITAL PSYCHOLOGY DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINE ALPHEUS CULMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA STATE HOSPITAL PSYCHOLOGY DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER BURLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMICARELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?