RAFFONE v. DIXON et al
Plaintiff: SALVATORE J RAFFONE
Defendant: TATIANA THOMAS, KEISHA JOHNSON, BRITNEY LEE, RONNIE QUINN, RICKY DIXON and MARIO CORRALES
Case Number: 4:2024cv00408
Filed: October 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Nos. #2 , #5 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $42.13 based on the average monthly balance in Plaintiffs inmate Trust Fund Account for the preceding six months as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). The filing fee is reduced to $350.00. Plaintiff has until 12/13/2024, to submit the initial partial filing fee of $42.13. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee, or no later than 12/13/2024. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 11/13/2024. (baf) (Copy of this order mailed to the Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500.)
November 12, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FORM UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITS, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
November 8, 2024 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SALVATORE J RAFFONE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (baf)
November 8, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FORM UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITS by SALVATORE J RAFFONE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (baf)
November 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SALVATORE J RAFFONE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (baf)
October 8, 2024 Set #4 Deadlines/Hearings Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2024. (baf)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis by state prisoners and a civil rights complaint form for use by state prisoners. Plaintiff has until 11/7/2024 to either: (1) file a proper in forma pauperis motion on the form provided to him with this Order or (2) pay the filing fee of $405.00. Ruling on Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is DEFERRED pending receipt of the amended pleading. Plaintiff also has until November 7, 2024 to file an amended complaint on the form provided to him in compliance with this Order. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 11/7/2024. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 10/8/2024. (baf) (Application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis by state prisoners and a civil rights complaint form for use by state prisoners sent by mail.)
October 7, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (baf)
October 7, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 COMPLAINT, #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by SALVATORE J RAFFONE. (baf)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SALVATORE J RAFFONE. (baf) (No service copies provided.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAFFONE v. DIXON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVATORE J RAFFONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATIANA THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEISHA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITNEY LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO CORRALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?