MCCONLEY v. WELLS FARGO BANK NA et al
Plaintiff: FORREST CRAIG MCCONLEY
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NA and WELLS FARGO ADVISORS
Case Number: 4:2024cv00484
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) by WELLS FARGO ADVISORS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (SOTO, SARA)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of an answeror other response to the complaint from the Defendants, upon the filing ofan executed or unexecuted summons, or no later than 3/4/2025. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 1/31/2025. (rcb)
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 LETTER/NOTICE TO THE COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS (rcb)
January 30, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 LETTER/NOTICE TO THE COURT WITH ATTACHMENTS. (rcb)
January 16, 2025 ACTION *NO LONGER* REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is no longer needed. **ACKNOWLEDGMENT DOCKETED IN THE WRONG CASE** Re: #7 Acknowledgment of Service-Ricky Dixon. (rcb) Modified to edit docket text-acknowledgment should have been filed in 4:24cv454 on 1/27/2025 (rcb).
January 15, 2025 Filing 7 **PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY-DOCKETED IN THE WRONG CASE**ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as RICKY DIXON RE: #5 Order. (rcb) Modified to edit docket text-acknowledgment should have been filed in 4:24-cv454 on 1/27/2025 (rcb).
December 4, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to WELLS FARGO ADVISORS, WELLS FARGO BANK NA. (rcb)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court issue a summons for each named Defendant, and deliver the summonses along with this Order to Plaintiff, who shall be responsible for prompt service of the summons and complaint upon the Defendants. The Clerk shall also forward to Plaintiff the AO-398 Form (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of a Summons) and two copies of the AO-399 Form (Waiver of the Service of Summons) for each Defendant which may be used if Plaintiff decides to request that Defendants waive formal service of the complaint. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the magistrate judge, with this case number written on it. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of an answer or other response to the complaint from the Defendants, upon the filing of an executed or unexecuted summons, or no later than 2/3/2025. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 12/4/2024. (rcb)*SUMMONSES ISSUED/FORMS FORWARDED AS DIRECTED**
December 4, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
December 4, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 400003941. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb)
December 4, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint. (rcb) Modified to remove referral language on 12/5/2024 (rcb).
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (rcb)
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO ADVISORS, WELLS FARGO BANK NA, filed by FORREST CRAIG MCCONLEY. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER) (rcb)**NO SERVICE COPY RECEIVED**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCONLEY v. WELLS FARGO BANK NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO ADVISORS
Represented By: SARA SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST CRAIG MCCONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?