OWENS v. EMS ADMINISTRATIONS
Plaintiff: J P OWENS
Defendant: EMS ADMINISTRATIONS
Case Number: 5:2008cv00030
Filed: January 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 14 Report and Recommendation - Case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to comply with a court order and failure to state a claim upon whichrelief may be granted. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/6/2009. (jws)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, re 11 Amended Complaint filed by J P OWENS: It is therefore, respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 01/27/2009. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/24/2009.) (krb)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by J P OWENS Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) is DENIED without prejudice. Clerk shall send pltf a motion IFP and a prisoner consent form and financia l certificate. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from docketing date of this order, Pltf shall (1) pay $350.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed IFP motion as directed. Filing Fee due by 3/2/2008 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 3/2/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on February 1, 2008.(cc: Owens w/ifp & consent) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. EMS ADMINISTRATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J P OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS ADMINISTRATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?