KELLY v ASTRUE
Plaintiff: DAVID W KELLY, JR
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 5:2008cv00071
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING the 38 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Attorney Fees is granted. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2009. (djb)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - 1) That pla's 36 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees be granted. 2) That pla's counsel, Heather Freeman, Esquire, is entitled to recover a reasonable fee for representing pla before the USDC f or the Northern District of FL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412 (EAJA); attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $4,276.74 are reasonable; and the Commissioner be directed to pay counsel that amount. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 9/17/2009. **Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/15/2009. (laj)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - 1) The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying disability benefits is REVERSED pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). 2) This case is REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with this Order. 3) The clerk shall ENTER Judgment accordingly and CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/5/2009. (laj)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Re: 1 Complaint - That the Commissioner's decision be AFFIRMED, that Judgment be entered in favor of the dft, and that the clerk be directed to close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 3/4/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/1/2009. (laj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELLY v ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID W KELLY, JR
Represented By: HEATHER F ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?