BLAIR v. MCNEIL
Petitioner: ALAN DALE BLAIR
Respondent: WALT MCNEIL
Case Number: 5:2008cv00264
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting re 17 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. §2254 Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , which challenges the conviction and sentence in State of Florida v. Alan Dale Blair in the Circuit Court of Escambia County, Florida, Case No. 02-5914, is denied. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/23/2009. (jcw)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ALAN DALE BLAIR: It is recommended that the 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus, challenging the conviction and sentence in State of Florida v. Alan Dale Blair in Escambia County Circuit Court, Case no. 02-5914, be DENIED, that this cause be DISMISSED, and the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/23/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on May 26, 2009. (cc: Blair) (cbj)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 13 Response to Habeas Petition filed by WALT MCNEIL - Petitioner to file reply to response within thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order. Reply due by 2/28/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on January 29, 2009.(cc: Blair) (cbj)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ALAN DALE BLAIR 1. Clerk to furnish copies of petition along with a copy of this order to respondent and the Atty Gen/FL. 2. Respondent shall have sixty (60) days fro m docketing date of this order to file response to petition. Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/14/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on September 15, 2008.(cc: Blair; McNeil [R/R# 7008 1300 0001 8567 8709], McCollum [R/R #7008 1300 0001 8567 8693] ) (cbj)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ALAN DALE BLAIR 1. Clerk shall forward IFP form to petitioner, with this case number written on it. 2. Within thirty (30) days of order date, petitioner shall either pay $5.00 filing fee, or submit completed application IFP. HABEAS Filing Fee due by 10/4/2008; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 10/4/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on September 4, 2008.(cc: Blair w/ifp) (cbj) Modified on 9/9/2008 (typo) (cbj).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAIR v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALAN DALE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WALT MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?