MORGAN v. SALE
Plaintiff: CARL DWAYNE MORGAN
Defendant: ROBERT SALE
Case Number: 5:2008cv00334
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denied 28 Motion to Set Aside Default and Reinstate Case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/26/2010. (sea)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denied as moot 22 Request for Entry of Default. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/20/2010. (sea)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is dismissed without prejudice because of Plaintiff's failure to comply with an order of the court and for failure to keep the clerk advised of his present address. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/18/2009. (jcw)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by CARL DWAYNE MORGAN: It is recommended - That this action be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with an order of the court and failure to keep the court advised of his present address. R&R flag set - Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/13/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on July 16, 2009. (cbj)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by CARL DWAYNE MORGAN - Clerk shall send pltf a form for non-prisoner civil rights case with this case number written on it. - Pltf shall file Amended Complaint within THIRTY (30) DAYS. Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on May 27, 2009.(cc: Morgan w/form) (cbj)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by CARL DWAYNE MORGAN 1. Pltf's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. 2. Clerk shall send Pltf an IFP form for use by non-prisoners. 3. Within T HIRTY (30) DAYS from docketing this order, pltf shall (1) pay $350.00 filing fee, or (2) submit completed IFP motion as directed. FILING Fee due by 12/5/2008; Alternatively, IFP Motions due by 12/5/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 5, 2008.(cc: Morgan w/ifp) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN v. SALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL DWAYNE MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?