KONEGAN v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: RICHARD KOWEGAN
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2009cv00014
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The complaint is DISMISSED for failure to abide by an order of the court and failure to pay the filing fee or apply properly for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/22/09. (pll)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by RICHARD KONEGAN: It is recommended - That this case be Dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with an order of the court. R&R flag set. - Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/13/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on July 16, 2009. (cbj)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by RICHARD KONEGAN; 1. Clerk shall send pltf an IFP motion and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate with this case number written on the forms. 2. Pltf shall pay $350.00 fil ing fee, or submit completed IFP motion within THIRTY (30) DAYS from docketing this order. Filing Fee due by 6/5/2009 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 6/5/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on May 6, 2009.(cc: Konegan w/ifp, etc) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KONEGAN v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD KOWEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?