PARKER v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: DAVID A PARKER
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 5:2009cv00189
Filed: May 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPROVED 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Pla's Petition for Attorney Fees Pursuant To The Equal Access To Justice Act 36 is granted. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/23/2010. (sea)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. RECOMMENDED that 36 "Plaintiffs Petition for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act" be GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 23, 2010. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/21/2010. (kvg)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 2. The decision of the Commissioner is reversed. The Commissioner is ordered to remand this case to the Administrative Law Judge for further proceedings consistent with the Report and Recommendation. 3. The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. §405(g) and to then close the file. 4. Plaintiff's Motion To Stay Proceedings Or Remand Pursuant To SentenceSix 21 is denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/5/2010. (jcw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKER v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID A PARKER
Represented By: HEATHER FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?