STEARNSMILLER v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: RICHARD L STEARNSMILLER
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 5:2009cv00215
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Gulf
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g). Plaintiff may file a new action, which must be accompanied by payment of the $350.00 filing fee in its entirety. All pending motions are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/17/2009. (jcw)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VACATED (See Order 35 )* REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 11 MOTION to Stay, 12 MOTION to Dismiss Action For Good Cause, 13 Notice To Defendants..., 14 MOTION for Ord er to Show Cause - It is recommended: 1. That Plaintiff's "Alternative Plaintiff's [sic] Motion to Dismiss Action for Good Cause," construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal, be Granted and this case be Dismissed without pr ejudice. 2. That all pending motions be Denied as moot. R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/9/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on August 12, 2009. (cbj) - *Modified on 11/16/2009 (to reflect court's ruling) (cbj).
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by RICHARD L STEARNSMILLER. 1. Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. 2. Plaintiff's 3 MOTION for Preliminary Ruling to File Non -Paper Rule 104 Evidence (a) Admissibility of HumidAir is DENIED. 3. Clerk shall send to pltf IFP form and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. This case number s/b written on the forms. Additionally, clerk shall return exhibits sub mitted with the complaint to plaintiff. 4. Pltf shall pay $350.00 filing fee, or submit completed IFP motion within THIRTY (30) DAYS from docketing date of this order. FILING Fee due by 7/24/2009 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 7/24/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on June 24, 2009.(cc: Stearnsmiller w/IFP, etc., Exhibits [box]) (cbj) Modified on 6/24/2009 (cbj).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEARNSMILLER v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD L STEARNSMILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?