SILFRAIN v. EIECHENLAUB
Defendant: C EIECHENLAUB
Petitioner: PATRICK SILFRAIN
Case Number: 5:2009cv00228
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ACCEPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. GRANTING 16 Motion to Dismiss filed by PATRICK SILFRAIN. The petition is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/5/09. (pll)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PATRICK SILFRAIN: It is recommended - That Petitioner's "Motion to Withdraw § 2241 Motion Without Prejudice" be Granted and this action dismissed without prejudice. -- R&R flag set. - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on October 2, 2009.- - Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/30/2009. (cbj)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PATRICK SILFRAIN - Respondent shall file a response to petitioner's "Motion to Withdraw § 2241 Motion Without Prejudice" by October 13, 2009. - - ( Response to motion due by 10/13/2009. ) - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on October 1, 2009. (cbj)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Response to Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by C EIECHENLAUB - Petitioner shall reply to Respondent's answer w/in thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order. - - Reply due by 10/19/2009. - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on September 18, 2009. (cbj)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by PATRICK SILFRAIN - 1. Clerk to furnish a copy of the petition and a copy of this order to Respondent and the United States Atty. - 2. Respondent shall have Sixty (60) days to show cause, if any, why relief requested should not be granted. - - Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/8/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on July 10, 2009.(copies provided to Eiechenlaub R/R# 7008 1300 0001 8567 9980, & United States Atty) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILFRAIN v. EIECHENLAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PATRICK SILFRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C EIECHENLAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?