STEWART v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION & VOC REHAB DIVISION et al
Plaintiff: BILLY CLIFTON STEWART
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION & VOC REHAB DIVISION and BILLY PALMER
Case Number: 5:2009cv00285
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER approving 58 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/27/2012. (jem)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - 1. Clerk to consolidate cases 5:09cv285/RS/MD; 5:09cv286/RS/MD; 5:10cv28/RS/MD. - - A copy of this order shall be placed in each of those cases. All future pleadings shall be filed in 5:09cv285/RS/MD (LEAD Case). - 2. Pla shall have twenty-eight (28) days to file Fourth Amended Complaint. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on August 5, 2010. (cbj)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 22 Amended Complaint filed by BILLY CLIFTON STEWART. - - 1. The clerk is directed to forward to the plaintiff a complaint form for use in non-prisoner pro se actions under 28 U.S.C. § 1331 or 42 U.S.C. § 1983. This case number shall be written on the form. - - 2. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a third and final amended complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on the court form. - - - (Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on December 8, 2009.- - (form to pla) (cbj)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by BILLY CLIFTON STEWART - 1. Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. - 2. Clerk to forward to plaintiff a complaint form for non-prisoner actions (28:1332 or 42:1 983) with this case number written on it. - 3. Within thirty (30) days from order date, plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint as instructed. - - Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on August 27, 2009.(Form to pla) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION & VOC REHAB DIVISION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY CLIFTON STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION & VOC REHAB DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?