MILLS v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: SYLVIA C. MILLS
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 5:2009cv00362
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVED 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granted 28 Plas Second Amended Petition For Attorneys Fee Under The Equal Access To Justice Act. Plas counsel is entitled to recover fees in the amount of $4,129.24. The filing fee cost in the amount of $350.00 is also awarded. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/6/2011. (sea)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - That Pla's 28 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be GRANTED as follows: Pla's counsel, Heather Freeman, is entitled to recover fees in the amount of $ 4,129.24 for representing Pla before the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412 (EAJA); the amount of attorney fees and hourly rates requested under the EAJA are reasonable; and the Commiss ioner is directed to pay counsel that amount. The filing fee cost in the amount of $350.00 is also awarded, to be paid from the Judgment Fund of the United States Treasury. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/14/2010. **Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/11/2011. (laj)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 21 Motion to Remand. 2. The Commissioner's Motion To Remand 21 is granted, and the Commissioner's decision denying benefits is reversed. 3. This case is remanded to the Commission of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. §405(g).4. The Commissioner is ordered to direct the Administrative Law Judge to offer Plaintiff a new hearing, complete the administrative record as necessary, and issue a new decision, as set forth in the Report and Recommendation. 5. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/14/2010. (jcw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLS v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA C. MILLS
Represented By: HEATHER FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?