BONANNO v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: ALLISON BONANNO
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 5:2010cv00025
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Adopting 22 Report and Recommendation - Decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. Case is DISMISSED. Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/11/2011. (jws)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by ALLISON BONANNO. - - 1. Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 6 is granted and this case may be filed and the pleadings may be served w/o prepayment of costs to the pla as provided in 28 U.S.C.§ 1915. - 2. Pla shall submit 3 service copies of complaint within 14 days. - 3. Upon receipt of the copies of the complaint, the clerk is directed to send three certified copies of this order, the service copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the USM. - 4. USM shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons upon Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, the USAG, and the office of US Atty for this district. - - (Service Copies due by 3/17/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on March 3, 2010. (cbj)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Of Deficiency) - re plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (received 2/18/2010) - - The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned by the Clerk without electronic filing. It may be resubmitted after the above noted deficiencies are corrected. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on February 19, 2010.- - (doc returned to pla's counsel) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONANNO v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON BONANNO
Represented By: QUINN ERIC BROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?