RED MOUNTAIN BANK NA v. TOP SHELF STORAGE II LLC et al
Plaintiff: RED MOUNTAIN BANK NA
Defendant: TOP SHELF STORAGE II LLC, LEE A SAGE and UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITY IN POSSESSION
Case Number: 5:2010cv00104
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/27/2011. (sea)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Based on the paragraph fourteen of the Pla's Response to my Show Cause Order 57 , Counts III and IV of the Complaint 2 are dismissed. The Amended Pretrial Order 37 is vacated. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/26/2011. (sea)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE in favor of RED MOUNTAIN BANK NA against TOP SHELF STORAGE II LLC and LEE A SAGE. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/3/2010. (cc: US Marshal, Panama City) (sea)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The bankruptcy case having been dismissed (Doc. 42 , attach. 1), the stay is now lifted. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/18/2010. (sea)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER The unknown person or entitity in possession of 105 Estes Place is terminated as a party pursuant to the order dated 7/7/2010 24 . ENTITY IN POSSESSION terminated.Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/10/2010. (sea)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Pla shall identify and serve the unknown person or entity in possession of 105 Estes Place within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order or the court shall strike them as a party. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/7/2010. (sea)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER 15 Initial Scheduling Order is vacated. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/6/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RED MOUNTAIN BANK NA v. TOP SHELF STORAGE II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RED MOUNTAIN BANK NA
Represented By: MEGAN ELAINE FORTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOP SHELF STORAGE II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE A SAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITY IN POSSESSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?