BARNARD v. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROBERT F BARNARD
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2010cv00213
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granted 104 Motion to file its Bill of Costs. Dft is granted leave to file its Bill of Costs out of time as an exhibit to its Motion on June 9, 2011. The clerk of the court shall tax costs for Dft in accordance with 28 U.S.C. §1920. The clerk shall disallow the claim of $6,393.49 for copies. Dft has failed to show that the copies were necessarily obtainedfor use in the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/14/2011. (sea)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. 1. Summary judgment is granted for Defendant against both Plaintiffs. 2. The Clerk is directed to close the file. 3. The Clerk is directed to post a copy of this order in case 5:09cv343/RS-CJK and close that file as well. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/25/2011. (jcw)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granted 29 Joint Motion to Dispense with Mediation. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/8/2011. (sea)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The parties shall not later than November 8, 2010, file an amended report of the Rule 26(f) planning meeting that includes Pla Robin Baxley, who has been joined to this case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/29/2010. (sea)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denied 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/28/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNARD v. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT F BARNARD
Represented By: MICHAEL S RYWANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?