JENSEN USA INC v. BRIM LAUNDRY MACHINERY CO INC
Plaintiff: JENSEN USA INC
Defendant: BRIM LAUNDRY MACHINERY CO INC
Case Number: 5:2010cv00256
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granted 38 Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. This case is dismissed with prejudice according to the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/6/2011. (sea)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER This case is dismissed from the active docket of the court. The clerk is directed to close the file of this case for administrative purposes, & upon the expiration of sixty days w/o activity, the clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/8/2011. (sea)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Amended Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/28/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/18/2011. (sea)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granted 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Pleading. Deft shall file its response no later than 12/20/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/2/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENSEN USA INC v. BRIM LAUNDRY MACHINERY CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENSEN USA INC
Represented By: DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIM LAUNDRY MACHINERY CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?