MILLER v. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: RUFUS S MILLER
Respondent: SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2010cv00276
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 30 Report and Recommendation. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/30/13. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, The petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED (deb)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Fourth MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Petition for Writo of Habeas Corpus filed by SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/3/2011)., Replies due by 7/5/2011, if any.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/5/2011. (jws)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Third MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/4/2011., Replies due by 6/3/2011, if any.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/5/2011. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RUFUS S MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?