EDWARDS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: KNOLLY EDWARDS
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, FEDERAL PRISON INDUSTRIES INC and JANE OR JOHN DOES
Case Number: 5:2010cv00286
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 55 SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR THE DEFENDANT SIMS. ACCEPTING 58 Report and Recommendation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/9/2014. (pll)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ACCEPTED in part. 24 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff must file a notice identifying unknown defendants against whom he will proceed. Case is REMANDED to magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Plaintiff Notice Deadline - by 4/5/2013.). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/27/2013. (jws)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 18 Second Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/16/2012).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/31/2012. (jws)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 10 First Amended Complaint filed by KNOLLY EDWARDS: Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form for prisoners in actions 28 U.S.C.§1331 or §1346. Plaintiff shall fully complete and file second amended complaint w/identical copy for each Defendant. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/7/2011. (Complaint form sent to Plaintiff.) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KNOLLY EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL PRISON INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE OR JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?