HOKE v. DELTA AIRLINES INC

Plaintiff: LAURYN DIANE HOKE
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00050
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court (DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR)ORDER granted 13 Pla's Motion for Leave to Amend. Denied as moot 8 Dft's Motion to Dismiss. Pla shall file her amended complaint not later than 7/13/2011. (Amended Pleading due by 7/13/2011.) Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/6/2011. (sea) Modified text on 7/6/2011 (sea).
July 18, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Report of Parties' Planning Meeting 18 . that the parties are directed to file an amended joint report not later than 7/28/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/18/2011. (sea)
October 11, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Agreed Motion for Protective Order 28 Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/11/2011. (sea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOKE v. DELTA AIRLINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURYN DIANE HOKE
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL LOESCHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.