FREEMAN et al v. OLIN CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: NORMAN FREEMAN and CHRISTY FREEMAN
Defendant: OLIN CORPORATION and BPS DIRECT
Case Number: 5:2012cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE re 77 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment, 78 Memorandum in Support of Motion, and 79 Statement of Facts filed by Defendants - Plaintiffs must file a response. Court will take Motion for Summary Judgment under advisement after response filed. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/28/2013). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/8/2013. (jws)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Defendants' 82 Motion the Designation of Courthouse Facilities for Location of Depositions is GRANTED. Clerk of Court in the Panama City Courthouse shall make conference room space available on 1/15/2013 for purposes of the mediation in this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/21/2012. (jws)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Designation of Courthouse Facilities for Location of Depositions. The Clerk of Court in the Panama City Courthouse shall make conference room space available on a date or dates mutually agreeable to the parties and the Clerk of Court, for purposes of taking the depositions of Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/8/2012. (jws)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: 68 MOTION to Extend Time of Discovery by Defendants is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All associated deadlines set forth in 38 Order are modified accordingly. Plaintiffs must provided Defendants dates available for depositions and mediation and additional documents subject of 39 Motion to Compel by 11/14/2012. (Discovery due by 12/31/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/7/2012. (jws)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Defendant, OLIN CORPORATION's 39 Request for Sanctions is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall pay the sum of $1,575.20 to Defendant as a sanction for the filing of Defendant's motion to compel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/2/2012. (jws)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 39 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Initial Disclosures, and for Sanctions filed by OLIN CORPORATION is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must respond in writing to Defendant's 2nd and 3rd Requests for Production by 8/31/2012. Plaintiffs may file a response to Olin's request for attorney fees. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/4/2012).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/22/2012. (jws)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14 ) is GRANTED. Count IV of the Amended Complaint as to Olin Corporation is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/4/2012. (jcw)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Counsel of record and any unrepresented parties shall confer (personally,by phone, or electronically) as required by Rule 26(f), and file the joint report with the Court. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/21/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/30/2012. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEMAN et al v. OLIN CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIN CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H GUFFEY
Represented By: STEPHEN F BOLTON
Represented By: MATTHEW D KNEPPER
Represented By: RANDAL KENT MULLENDORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS DIRECT
Represented By: STEPHEN F BOLTON
Represented By: JOSEPH H GUFFEY
Represented By: MATTHEW D KNEPPER
Represented By: RANDAL KENT MULLENDORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?