HENRY v. LIPFORD et al.
Plaintiff: JOHNATHON JAY HENRY
Defendant: GORDON, JONES, WILLIAMS, PEACOCK and LIPFORD
Case Number: 5:2012cv00034
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADOPTING 105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/19/2014. (jcw)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/29/2013. (jcw)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/16/2012. (jws)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LIPFORD, PEACOCK is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if answer/response not filed earlier: 9/4/2012).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/6/2012. (jws)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Clerk directed to issue summons for Defendant, DOCTOR GORDON indicating 60 days to file a response to 13 Second Amended Complaint. Clerk to send summons, copy of order, and copy of amended complaint to Alexandria Walters, Assistant General Counsel for DOC, 501 S Calhoun St, Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/14/2013. (jws)(Forms to Fla Asst General Counsel per Order.)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights form and motion for IFP for prisoner litigants. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/12/2012. (Forms to Plaintiff per Order.) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENRY v. LIPFORD et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEACOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNATHON JAY HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?