SALAS-ALVAREZ et al v. GRAVES CREEK INC.
Plaintiff: RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ and PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ
Defendant: GRAVES CREEK INC. doing business as WYRICK & SONS PINE STRAW
Case Number: 5:2014cv00323
Filed: October 1, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1801
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2016 Filing 101 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #100 Order on Motion for Settlement. (kgc)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT granting #99 Motion for Settlement. All claims are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. The Clerk must enter judgment and close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/24/16. (kgc)
March 22, 2016 Filing 99 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval - JOINT AMENDED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE AND FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Settlement Agreement) (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REJECTING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT denying #97 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO. Parties must submit for approval a revised settlement agreement or, in the alternative, file an update regarding the status of negotiations by 3/22/2016. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/16. (kgc)
February 29, 2016 Filing 97 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADDRESSING EXPIRED DEADLINE denying as moot #84 Sealed Motion. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/29/16. (kgc)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND SETTING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL granting #94 MOTION RELIEF FROM JUDGEMENT filed by BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO. The previously entered judgment #81 is VACATED. The parties' motion for settlement approval is due on or before 2/29/2016. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/28/16. (kgc)
January 27, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION RELIEF FROM JUDGEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b), FED.R.CIV.P. re #80 Order, #81 Clerk's Judgment by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 21, 2016 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2016 re #84 SEALED MOTION ( Rule 60 Motion due by 1/27/2016.). Within 10 days of entry of order granting Rule 60 Motion, counsel shall file Motion to Approve Settlement. (Court Reporter Lisa Jones.) (pll)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #91 Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk must disconnect Ms. Boyd from receipt of CM/ECF notices in this case. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/21/16. (kgc)
January 20, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION to Withdraw by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (BOYD, CECILIA)
January 8, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on #84 MOTION and #87 Document: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2016 10:00 AM CST / 11:00 AM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Parties are instructed to call (850) 521-3631 at the time of hearing. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (pll)
January 8, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on #84 MOTION and #87 Document:Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2016 2:30 PM CST / 03:30 PM ESTin U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Parties are instructed to call (850) 521-3631 at the time of hearing. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (pll)
January 7, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on #84 Motion and #87 Document :Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 4:30 PM CST / 5:30 PM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Parties are instructed to call (850) 521-3631 at the time of hearing. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (pll)
January 5, 2016 Filing 87 Sealed Document. (kgc)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE re #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #84 SEALED MOTION. Plaintiffs shall respond to ECF No. 84 on or before January 6, 2016. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/31/2015.( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/6/2016).) (jcw)
December 30, 2015 Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #84 SEALED MOTION by RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
December 16, 2015 Filing 84 SEALED MOTION by GRAVES CREEK INC. (kgc)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL MOTION TO COMPEL OR MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by GRAVES CREEK INC. Defendant may file its motion to compel Plaintiffs' compliance under seal on or before 12/18/2015. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/15/15. (kgc)
December 14, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion to Compel by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (MOWREY, RONALD)
September 15, 2015 Filing 81 *VACATED per #95 Order* CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #80 Order (kgc) Modified on 1/28/2016 (kgc).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re #79 Mediation Report - Settled. The clerk must enter judgment and close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/14/15. (kgc)
September 11, 2015 Filing 79 MEDIATION REPORT - Settled (FARRELL, PATRICK)
September 8, 2015 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 9/8/2015. Court hears issues pertaining to remaining two depositions. The two remaining depositions shall be limited to two hours each; 3:30 - 5:30 p.m. and 5:30 - 7:30 p.m. (Court Reporter Lisa Jones.) (pll)
September 8, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/8/2015 2:00 PM CST / 03:00 PM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. The Court will call 1-855-747-8824 - 6425557- at the time of hearing. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (pll)
August 25, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE Notice of Service of Defendant's First Request for Admissions, Second Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatories by GRAVES CREEK INC. (MOWREY, RONALD)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL DEADLINES - granting #73 Joint MOTION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES AND MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/21/2015. Discovery due by 9/30/2015. Deadline for Plaintiffs to provide reports from retained experts is 9/15/2015. Deadline for Defendants to provide reports from retained experts is 10/15/2015. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/10/15. (kgc)
August 7, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE Notice of Service of Defendant Graves Creek Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production, Inspection and Copying of Documents and Things by GRAVES CREEK INC. (MOWREY, RONALD)
August 7, 2015 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES AND MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Attorney Conference to take place by 10/12/2015. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/26/2015. Bench Trial set for 12/8/2015 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2015 01:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/3/15. (kgc)
June 24, 2015 Filing 71 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint, by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (MOWREY, RONALD)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL : This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Defendant, ECF No. #67 , filed by Deborah S. Minnis. The motion is GRANTED. Ms. Minnis is allowed to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. Rebecca S. Daffin and Cecilia R. Boyd shall remain as co-counsel for Defendant. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for Ms. Minnis. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/16/2015. (dac)
June 15, 2015 Filing 69 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
June 15, 2015 Filing 68 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
June 15, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (MINNIS, DEBORAH)
June 15, 2015 Filing 66 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attorney time records) (MOWREY, RONALD)
June 15, 2015 Filing 65 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (MOWREY, RONALD)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AMENDING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER re #16 Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/15/2015. (jcw)
June 15, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Mediation by GRAVES CREEK INC. (MOWREY, RONALD)
June 15, 2015 Filing 62 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
June 15, 2015 Filing 61 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
June 11, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE of Intent to Withdraw by GRAVES CREEK INC. (BOYD, CECILIA)
June 10, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF HEARING: Bench Trial reset for 12/8/2015 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 30 W. Government St., Panama City, Florida 32401. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (pll)
June 10, 2015 Filing 58 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY RELIEF, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, COSTS OF LITIGATION AND ATTORNEYS FEE against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re #56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel is permitted to withdraw. Defendant shall continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for Ms. Daffin on this case. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/10/2015. (jcw)
June 9, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
June 4, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Unavailability by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #49 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO AMEND PLEADINGS. Plaintiffs may amend their complaint on or before June 10, 2015. Defendant shall file its response within fourteen days of service of the amended complaint. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/3/2015. (jcw) Modified on 6/9/2015 to correct title (jcw).
June 3, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Intent to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant by GRAVES CREEK INC. (MINNIS, DEBORAH)
June 3, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended complaint due by 6/10/2015 re #54 Order (jcw)
June 2, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Unavailability by GRAVES CREEK INC. (MOWREY, RONALD)
June 2, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #26 Scheduling Order,, Case Referred to Mediation, #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS filed by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (MOWREY, RONALD)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK no longer assigned to case. Please add the new judge initials to the case number for all future filings - 5:14cv323-MW/GRJ. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2015. (kjw)
May 28, 2015 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: #49 MOTION for Extension of Time (jcw)
May 27, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #26 Scheduling Order,, Case Referred to Mediation, #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
May 15, 2015 Filing 48 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
May 15, 2015 Filing 47 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
May 5, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD AARON MOWREY on behalf of GRAVES CREEK INC. (MOWREY, RONALD)
April 15, 2015 Filing 45 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
April 15, 2015 Filing 44 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
April 9, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH STEPHENS MINNIS on behalf of GRAVES CREEK INC. (MINNIS, DEBORAH)
March 16, 2015 Filing 42 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
March 16, 2015 Filing 41 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
February 15, 2015 Filing 40 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (BOYD, CECILIA)
February 15, 2015 Filing 39 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (BOYD, CECILIA)
February 14, 2015 Filing 38 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
February 14, 2015 Filing 37 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
February 13, 2015 Filing 36 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
February 13, 2015 Filing 35 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL terminated. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/26/15. (kgc)
January 26, 2015 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: #33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (kgc)
January 23, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 15, 2015 Filing 32 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
January 15, 2015 Filing 31 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
January 15, 2015 Filing 30 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ. (MARTINEZ, KARLA)
January 15, 2015 Filing 29 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ. (MARTINEZ, KARLA)
January 15, 2015 Filing 28 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (BOYD, CECILIA)
January 15, 2015 Filing 27 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (BOYD, CECILIA)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: (Discovery due by 8/28/2015, Bench Trial set for 11/16/2015 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK, Mediation Report due by 9/30/2015.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/15/15. (kgc)
January 15, 2015 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK notified that action is needed Re: #25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Scheduling and Mediation Order needed. Clerk to check status on 1/22/2015. (kgc)
January 14, 2015 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 8, 2015 Filing 24 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
January 8, 2015 Filing 23 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
January 2, 2015 Filing 22 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
January 2, 2015 Filing 21 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
December 31, 2014 Filing 20 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (MARTINEZ, KARLA)
December 31, 2014 Filing 19 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (MARTINEZ, KARLA)
December 19, 2014 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
December 18, 2014 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/19/2014. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/20/2015. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/5/14. (kgc)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER vacating #6 Initial Scheduling Order. The Clerk is directed to reissue and Initial Scheduling Order in this case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/5/14. (kgc)
December 4, 2014 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER - The motion to dismiss or transfer, ECF No. #5 is GRANTED IN PART. The case is transferred to the Panama City division. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the transfer. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/18/2014. (sac)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ORDER PROHIBITING THE FILING OF MONTHLY ATTORNEY'S FEE RECORDS re #6 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/17/2014. (sac)
November 17, 2014 Filing 11 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
November 17, 2014 Filing 10 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
November 15, 2014 Filing 9 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
November 15, 2014 Filing 8 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
November 10, 2014 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS, JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Josiel Romero, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Sisi Chen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Andrea Ortega, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - DCF PO#AABC2F - Wyrick & Sons Pine Straw, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Government Contracts, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Awarded Government Contracts) (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **Vacated per #15 Order**INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/12/2014. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/12/2014. Discovery due by 2/24/2015. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/29/2014. (sac) Modified on 12/5/2014 (kgc).
October 25, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by GRAVES CREEK INC.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/12/2014). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Wyrick Declaration) (DAFFIN, REBECCA)
October 23, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS. GRAVES CREEK INC. served on 10/9/2014, answer due 10/30/2014. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
October 1, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GRAVES CREEK INC. (sac)
October 1, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ORTEGA, GLADYS)
October 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY RELIEF, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, COSTS OF LITIGATION AND ATTORNEYS FEE against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1129-3068320.), filed by JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA, ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO, JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA, JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA, AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS, FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ, SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA, RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ, PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ, VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR GRAVES CREEK INC., d/b/a WYRICK & SONS PINE STRAW INC.) (ORTEGA, GLADYS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAS-ALVAREZ et al v. GRAVES CREEK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMIRO SALAS-ALVAREZ
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMPARO ANTONIO BANUELOS-POSADAS
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNULFO MARTINEZ-MORENO
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGIO ARMANDO MORENO-SAUCEDA
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENITO PEREZ-SALINAS
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN LUIS RAMOS-ARANDA
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS MARTIN SAUCEDA-PINEDA
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO TORREZ-RUIZ
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE ZAPATA-BELLEZA
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT A. BLANCO-FERNANDEZ
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO VAZQUEZ-TORREZ
Represented By: GREGORY SCOTT SCHELL
Represented By: KARLA CECILIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE CALDWELL
Represented By: GLADYS ANDREA ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAVES CREEK INC. doing business as WYRICK & SONS PINE STRAW
Represented By: MARK LUGO MASON
Represented By: CECILIA REDDING BOYD
Represented By: DEBORAH STEPHENS MINNIS
Represented By: REBECCA SOUTHWELL DAFFIN
Represented By: RONALD AARON MOWREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?