TATUM v. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: LINDSEY TATUM
3Rd Party Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: 231 PAINT & BODY SHOP INC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00165
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
0 Judge: GARY R JONES
1 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 19 Featured Case FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #18 REPORT Of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 4/26/2019. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions due by 5/26/2019. Mediation to take place by 5/24/2019. Mediation Report due by 6/7/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/10/2018. (MB)
August 29, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
August 27, 2018 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MCMICHEN, COLIN)
August 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand , #17 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
August 17, 2018 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wheeler, #2 Exhibit B - Lambert, #3 Exhibit C - Davis Tune, #4 Exhibit D - Schmidt) (YOUNG, B)
August 15, 2018 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. 231 PAINT & BODY SHOP INC served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (YOUNG, B)
August 8, 2018 Set Deadlines re #15 MOTION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/22/2018). (MB)
August 7, 2018 15 MOTION to Remand by LINDSEY TATUM. (MCMICHEN, COLIN)
July 30, 2018 14 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to 231 PAINT & BODY SHOP INC. (djb)
July 30, 2018 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against 231 Paint & Body Shop, Inc., filed by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons for 231 Paint & Body Shop, Inc.) (YOUNG, B)
July 23, 2018 12 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Kathy J. Maus, Esq. by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kathy Maus, Esq.) (YOUNG, B)
July 23, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER. Defendant Progressive Select Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED, but the bad faith claim stated in Count II, ECF No. #1 - #1 at #4 , is ABATED pending resolution of Count I. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/23/2018. (MB)
July 20, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to File re #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Motion for Leave to File Reply by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (YOUNG, B)
July 20, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION for PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY.. (YOUNG, B)
July 20, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II filed by LINDSEY TATUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). (MB)
July 19, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II filed by LINDSEY TATUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MCMICHEN, COLIN)
July 17, 2018 7 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/31/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/30/2018. Discovery due by 1/17/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/17/2018. (MB)
July 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
July 16, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JAMES MOODY on behalf of PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY (MOODY, THOMAS)
July 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENTT EARL PALMER on behalf of PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY (PALMER, BRENTT)
July 16, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/30/2018). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint) (YOUNG, B)
July 16, 2018 3 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (YOUNG, B)
July 16, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (YOUNG, B)
July 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, FL, case number 18000566CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4230687.), filed by PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - All pleadings) (YOUNG, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TATUM v. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSEY TATUM
Represented By: COLIN LEE MCMICHEN
Represented By: R WAYLON THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRENTT EARL PALMER
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Represented By: B RICHARD YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: 231 PAINT & BODY SHOP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?