PHILISTIN v. CANTRELL

Plaintiff: JEFFNEY PHILISTIN
Defendant: B CANTRELL, S PAYNE and C NESBITT
Case Number: 5:2018cv00166
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Gulf
0 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
1 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #10 REPLY (titled, "Supplement Appendix A; Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment; Reply to Order to Show Cause"), re #7 Order to Show Cause. (MB)
September 10, 2018 10 REPLY (titled, "Supplement Appendix A; Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment; Reply to Order to Show Cause"), re #7 Order to Show Cause, by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (MB)
September 6, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #8 Response to Order to Show Cause, #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (titled, "MOTION To Proceed Without Prepayment"),. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
September 4, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (titled, "MOTION To Proceed Without Prepayment"), by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (MB)
September 4, 2018 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (MB)
August 23, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 08/23/2018. Show Cause Response due by 9/13/2018. (MB)
August 21, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Initial partial filing fee not received per ORDER. (MB)
August 6, 2018 Set Deadlines per #5 ORDER. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/20/2018. (MB)
August 6, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (Received 3 Service copies). (MB)
July 27, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #6 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. (sdw)
July 27, 2018 6 PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (sdw)
July 18, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee. Clerk of court shall assess Plaintiff $10.66 as an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Clerk of court shall MAIL a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 07/18/2018. (Letter w/ORDER sent to DOC). (MB)
July 17, 2018 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint (Received 3 Service copies). (MB)
July 16, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
July 16, 2018 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (MB)
July 16, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (MB)
July 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against B CANTRELL, C NESBITT, S PAYNE, filed by JEFFNEY PHILISTIN. (No service copies). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILISTIN v. CANTRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B CANTRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C NESBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFNEY PHILISTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?