POPPELL v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L POPPELL
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Case Number: 5:2018cv00188
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/18. **Please use the new initials MCR/MJF on all future pleadings; i.e. 5:18cv188-MCR/MJF. (pll) Modified on 9/20/2018 (pll).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denied as moot re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TIMOTHY L POPPELL. (Amended Pleadings with service copies for each defendant due by 10/16/2018). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/17/2018. (atm) Civil complaint form sent - Modified on 9/18/2018 (atm).
September 5, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (atm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TIMOTHY L POPPELL. (atm) (document sealed due to privacy information).
August 21, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint - new case (tss)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (tss)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS (Filing fee $400) filed by TIMOTHY L POPPELL (NO SERVICE COPIES) (tss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPPELL v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L POPPELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?