METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. BAILEY et al
Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Monalisa Bennett and Juhvanna Marie Bailey
Case Number: 5:2018cv00251
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MONALISA BENNETT. (jcw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Summons) (JACOBSON, JEANNINE)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. JUHVANNA MARIE BAILEY waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (PARKER, LATANAE)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNINE CLINE JACOBSON on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (JACOBSON, JEANNINE)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4331603.), filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, EUGENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. BAILEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: EUGENE P MURPHY
Represented By: JEANNINE CLINE JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monalisa Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juhvanna Marie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?