WILLIAMS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Plaintiff: LARRY JEROME WILLIAMS
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and PANE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00041
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
1 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: re #4 . This case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as malicious, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). The Clerk of the Court be directed to close the case file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/18/19. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/15/2019. (mlp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). However, the total filing fee in this case remains $350.00. As funds become available in Plaintiff's prison account, he must make monthly payments of twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income (that is, all funds deposited into the account) in each case he has filed in this court. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the clerk of court shallforward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to have a United States Magistrate Judge handle proceedings in this action, with the case number written on it. Plaintiff is warned that he is ultimately responsible for payment of the filing fee should the agency with custody over him lapse in its duty to make payments on his behalf. Finally, Plaintiff is advised that dismissal or other disposition of this action will NOT relieve him of the obligation to pay the full filing fee in this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/6/19. Order and letter mailed to DOC, Agency Clerk as well as form mailed to Plaintiff. (mlp)
March 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Amended Complaint, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (mlp)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRY JEROME WILLIAMS. (mlp)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LARRY JEROME WILLIAMS. (mlp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The clerk shall send Plaintiff: (a) civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983; and (b) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (a) file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule41(a)(1)(A)(i); or (b) file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, which shall be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, andmarked "Amended Complaint." Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff shall: (a) pay the filing fee of $400.00; or (b) submit a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate, including an attached computer printout of the transactions in his prison account during the preceding six-month period. Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of any subsequent change of address, Plaintiff shall inform the clerk of the court of his new address. Such notice shall be labeled "Notice of Change of Address" and shall include this case number on it. Failure to comply with this order likely will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an order of the court, failure to prosecute, and/or failure to pay the filing fee, or properly seek to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/14/19. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2019., IFP or Fee due by 3/18/2019.)(Forms mailed to Plaintiff as directed). (mlp)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se mailed. (mlp)
February 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (mlp)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LARRY JEROME WILLIAMS. No service copies provided and no filing paid. (mlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY JEROME WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?