THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN v. UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S)

Petitioner: THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN
Claimant: UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00096
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 29 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #28 NOTICE of Service of DISCOVERY, by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (MB)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of DISCOVERY, by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (FINK, DOUGLAS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF EXONERATION AGAINST ALL NON-FILING PARTIES. Petitioner's #25 MOTION for Entry of Default is GRANTED. A Final Default Judgment of Exoneration is hereby entered against all parties and claimants having an interest in this matter, other than claimants JAMES and JAQUELINE LOVETT, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 55 and Supplemental Rule F(5), for failure to file a claim or answer in this action; and Petitioner is hereby exonerated from any responsibility, loss, damage, or injury from all claims arising out of the incident on October 10, 2018, except for those claims timely filed by JAMES and JAQUELINE LOVETT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/3/2019. (MB)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 2/22/2020. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/16/2020. Mediation to take place by 3/23/2020. Mediation Report due by 4/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (MB)
July 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #25 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment of Exoneration Against All Non-Filing Parties (MB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment of Exoneration Against All Non-Filing Parties by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (MASSEE, JULES)
June 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #24 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MASSEE, JULES)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL NON-FILING CLAIMANTS on June 27, 2019. (MB)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Petitioner's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against All Non-Filing Parties, ECF No. #21 , is GRANTED. The defaults of all persons, other than James Lovett and Jacqueline Lovett, claiming damages for any and all losses, damages, injuries, and destruction arising out of, occasioned or occurring from the incident set forth in the Complaint are noted, and those non-appearing claimants are hereby barred from filing any claims and answers in this proceeding or any proceeding related to the incident set forth in the Complaint. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's Default against all non-filing claimants. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/27/2019. (MB)
June 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against All Non-Filing Parties (MB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against All Non-Filing Parties by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (MASSEE, JULES)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time (14 days, to July 2, 2019, to file joint report). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/19/2019. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/2/2019.) (MB)
June 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION to Extend Time[on behalf of James Lovett and Jacqueline Lovett] (MB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Time[on behalf of James Lovett and Jacqueline Lovett] by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (FINK, DOUGLAS)
June 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 REPLY by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN re #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Claim, PETITIONER'S OBJECTION, REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE CLAIM OF JAMES AND JACQUELINE LOVETT by TH OMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (MB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN re #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Claim , PETITIONER'S OBJECTION, REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE CLAIM OF JAMES AND JACQUELINE LOVETT by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (MASSEE, JULES)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (MASSEE, JULES)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Appearance to Appear for Claimants James Lovett and Jacqueline Lovett] by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (FINK, DOUGLAS) Modified on 6/3/2019 to correct event pdf to match ECF. (MB).
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by PAUL THOMAS BECKMANN (BECKMANN, PAUL)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The MAUNEYS have up and through June 18, 2019, to answer the Petition of MUDGE and file any Claim. This extension applies only to the claim of the MAUNEYS, all others must claim as required by the Monition, ECF No. #6 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/20/2019. (Answer due by 6/18/2019.) (MB)
May 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim. (sdw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, and Claim to MUDGE Petition (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by James Scott Mauney, Natalie J. Mauney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MESCOLOTTO, ANDREW)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proof of Publication of the Notice of Monition) (MASSEE, JULES)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Attorney Douglas W. Fink, of the law firm of Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC, is admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants, James Lovett and Jacqueline Lovett, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/17/2019. (sdw)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/17/2019. (sdw)
May 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas W. Fink. (sdw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas W. Fink.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4494416.) by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (BECKMANN, PAUL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (SHEEKLEY, LESLIE)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM Property Damage by UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S). (SHEEKLEY, LESLIE)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MONITION To The Marshal of the United States of America For The United States District Court For The Northern District Of Florida. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/11/2019. (MONITION sent to USMS as instructed). (Response deadlines 5/17/2019).) (MB)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, NOTICE OF MONITION, AND INJUNCTION, re #2 MOTION TO APPROVE AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND ENTER MONITION AND INJUNCTION. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/11/2019. (Respective claims to be filed by 5/17/2019.) (MB)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, NOTICE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Notice of Monition and Injunction) (MASSEE, JULES)
April 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Stipulation (AD INTERIM FOR COSTS AND VALUE), #2 MOTION TO APPROVE AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND ENTER MONITION AND INJUNCTION , #1 Complaint (MB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION (AD INTERIM FOR COSTS AND VALUE) by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (MASSEE, JULES)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO APPROVE AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND ENTER MONITION AND INJUNCTION by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Monition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Monition) (MASSEE, JULES)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4451879.), filed by THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MASSEE, JULES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN v. UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS MUDGE, AS OWNER OF BOUT TIME AGAIN
Represented By: JULES V MASSEE
Represented By: ROBERT B BIRTHISEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: UNKNOWN CLAIMANT(S)
Represented By: PAUL THOMAS BECKMANN
Represented By: DOUGLAS WARREN FINK
Represented By: LESLIE DEAN SHEEKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?