LANG et al v. FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Ina Lang and Wilfred Lang
Defendant: First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00112
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL, Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery deadline is 11/21/2019. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions is 12/12/2019. Mediation in this case must be completed on or before 12/19/2019. Mediation Report due by 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (alb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed KAREN K KARABINOS for FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb)
July 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen K. Karabinos.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4537488.) (alb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen K. Karabinos.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4537488.) by FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - certificate of good standing, #2 Supplement Consent to Designated Local Counsel) (BURKE, PAUL)
June 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BURKE, PAUL)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by INA LANG, WILFRED LANG identifying Other Affiliate Citrus Contracting, LLC., Other Affiliate Noble Public Adjusting Group for INA LANG, WILFRED LANG.. (BALDWIN, MATTHEW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY. (BURKE, PAUL)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/4/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/21/2019. (alb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW L BALDWIN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BALDWIN, MATTHEW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ATTORNEY JOSEPH P. GLACE Re: #4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT, mailed to Attorney Joseph P. Glace, Vargas Gonzales Hevia Baldwin LLP, 2050 W. Co Highway 3-A, Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32459. (alb) (Mail resent to same address however with a different format.) (alb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT, mailed to Attorney Joseph P. Glace, Vargas Gonzales Hevia Baldwin LLP, 2050 W. Co Highway 3-A, Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32459. (alb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to Attorney Joseph P. Glace, Vargas Gonzales Hevia Baldwin LLP, 2050 W. Co Highway 3-A, Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32459. (alb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company from In the Circuit court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit and for the County of Bay, case number 19000889CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4469928.), filed by First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Answer, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit Ex C - part 1 - Affidavit of Keith Frohock, #5 Exhibit Ex C - part 2 - Affidavit of Keith Frohock, #6 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #7 Exhibit Ex D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (BURKE, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANG et al v. FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company
Represented By: PAUL WILLARD BURKE
Represented By: KAREN K KARABINOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Lang
Represented By: MATTHEW L BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Lang
Represented By: MATTHEW L BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?