JACKSON v. JENKINS et al
Plaintiff: ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON and ANTWAN JOVAN JACKSON
Defendant: LANIER, JENKINS, PLYBON, JUSTICE and SHIVELY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00114
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order. Within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order, Plaintiff shallshow cause why this case should not be dismissed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 7/3/2019. Show Cause Response due by 7/17/2019. (jcw)
July 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment - Initial partial filing fee has not been received. (jcw)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of ANTWAN JOVAN JACKSON. Plaintiff shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order in which to submit the initial partial filing fee ($2.97) as assessed by the clerk of court. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J. FRANK on 5/22/2019. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/21/2019.)(cc: DOC as directed)(Form mailed as ordered.) (jcw)
May 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTWAN JOVAN JACKSON. (jcw)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Preserve Evidence, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk of the court shall send Plaintiff a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the form. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (a) submit payment in the amount of $400.00; (b) file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis on the court form; or (c) file a notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 4/29/2019. ( IFP/Fee due by 5/30/2019.)(Form mailed as ordered.) (jcw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se mailed. (mlp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE (titled "LETTER TO CLERK") by ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON. (mlp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON. (mlp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE (titled "MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE") by ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON. (mlp)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON. No service copies or filing fee received. (mlp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #1 Supplement Memorandum) (mlp).
April 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice (titled "MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE"), #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #4 Notice (titled "LETTER TO CLERK"). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (mlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. JENKINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLYBON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIVELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTWAN JOVON JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTWAN JOVAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?