NELSON v. FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN
Plaintiff: JOHN NELSON
Defendant: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN
Case Number: 5:2019cv00126
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f). Discovery due by 1/25/2020. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions to be filed by 2/18/2020. Mediation to take place by 2/24/2020. Mediation Report due by 3/9/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/12/2019. (MB)
June 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LAVISKY, MATTHEW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN identifying Corporate Parent FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, Corporate Parent FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, Corporate Parent TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE for FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN.. (LAVISKY, MATTHEW)
May 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JOHN NELSON. (CASSEL, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LAVISKY, MATTHEW)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2019. Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/14/2019. (MB)
May 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN from CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, case number 2019-CA-000114. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4487201.), filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (LAVISKY, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NELSON
Represented By: HILLARY BRISSON CASSEL
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN CASSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN LAVISKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?