PETERS v. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: AUTUMN PETERS
Defendant: TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00138
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv138-TKW/MJF.
July 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER on behalf of TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY (DETWEILER, KEITH)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/24/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/10/2019. (sdw)
June 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Appearance. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of AUTUMN PETERS (BOGGS, AMY)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Tower Hill Holdings, Inc. for TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to Pla's counsel) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT) (sdw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 19001267CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4497176.), filed by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - SFIP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERS v. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP
Represented By: KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTUMN PETERS
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?