BREEDEN et al v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: RICHARD BREEDEN and DENISE GLASER
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY and LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00162
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOGGS, AMY)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, answer due 7/25/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/17/2019. (alb)
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (alb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Order. (No answer filed.) (alb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (alb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by RICHARD BREEDEN, DENISE GLASER re #9 Amended Complaint (BOGGS, AMY)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by RICHARD BREEDEN, DENISE GLASER. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying as moot #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file a final version of their First Amended Complaint within 7 days of the date this Order is filed. Defendant must file a response within 14 days thereafter. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019, Answer due by 7/15/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/24/2019. (alb)
June 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #7 Response to Motion. (alb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by RICHARD BREEDEN, DENISE GLASER. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/20/2019. (alb)
June 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (alb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by RICHARD BREEDEN, DENISE GLASER. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/14/2019. (alb)
June 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #1 Notice of Removal. (alb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY US INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY INC for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit for Bay County, Florida, case number 19001594CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4521415.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (COLGAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREEDEN et al v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BREEDEN
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE GLASER
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?