HOLSOMBAKE v. INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JAMES HOLSOMBAKE
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00165
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Indian Harbor Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. (ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY for INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY.. (ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/17/2019. (MB)
June 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY from Bay County, case number 19001306CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4522204.), filed by INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLSOMBAKE v. INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HOLSOMBAKE
Represented By: ANDREW PHILIP MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN JOSEPH ZIMMERN
Represented By: JUAN ANTONIO FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?