DORRIS v. WALMART INC
Plaintiff: Nicola Dorris
Defendant: WALMART INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00180
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline is extended to 3/2/2020. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 25 days after the close of discovery by 3/27/2020. Mediation in this case must be completed on or before a date 28 days after the discovery deadline 3/30/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report 4/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (alb)
August 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TALBERT, JAMES)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WALMART INC identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC for WALMART INC.. (LONGORIA, DIANE)
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Scheduling Order. (No Corporate Disclosure Statement filed.) (alb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb)
July 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by WALMART INC. Amendment to #2 Notice (Other) Of Filing Rule 7.2 A Documents (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Initial Complaint, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Notice of Appearance for Plaintiff, #5 Notice of Appearance for Defendant, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (LONGORIA, DIANE)
June 28, 2019 JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK added. (erl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by WALMART INC. (LONGORIA, DIANE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS by WALMART INC re #1 Notice of Removal (LONGORIA, DIANE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC from Bay County, case number 2019CA000714. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4536433.), filed by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (LONGORIA, DIANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DORRIS v. WALMART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Dorris
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Represented By: JAMES GARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DIANE M LONGORIA
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?